Mr. Suvit Pipatvilaikul Mr. Suvit Pipatvilaikul failed to report to the SEC Office the acquisition or disposal of News Network Corporation Public Company Limited (NEWS) shares held by his nominee
Mr. Suvit Pipatvilaikul Mr. Suvit Pipatvilaikul failed to report to the SEC Office the acquisition or disposal of Polaris Capital Public Company Limited (POLAR) shares held by his nominee within the
Mr. Khampol Viratepsuporn Mr. Khampol Viratepsuporn failed to report to the SEC Office the acquisition or disposal of Polaris Capital Public Company Limited (POLAR) shares held by his nominee
Mr. Sathit Roongwatanapak Between September 26, 2013 to May 22, 2015, Mr. Sathit Roongwatanapak acquired or disposed Asset Bright Public Company Limited (ABC) shares through his nominee trading
Mr. Sathit Roongwatanapak On November 16, 2018, Mr. Sathit Roongwatanapak disposed Digital Tech Planet Public Company Limited (DIGI) shares in the amount of 338,556,100 shares which equaled to 21.42
Mr. Porameth Rungrongtanin On November 16, 2018 Mr. Porameth Rungrongtanin acquired Digital Tech Planet Public Company Limited (DIGI) shares in the amount of 338,556,100 shares which equaled to 21.42
Mr. Pete Bodharamik On December 22, 2015 to February 8, 2017 Mr. Pete Bodharamik acquired of Jasmine Telecom Systems Public Company Limited (“JTS”) shares held by Mr. Krirkrai Tribunyatkul and Mr
Mr.Pongsak Lothongkam On December, 2017. Mr.Pongsak Lothongkam acquires SVI Public Company Limited (SVI) shares in Eagle Mount Asia Equities Limited’s securities trading account (nominee) , causing
Mr. Kavin Phongpandecha Mr. Kavin Phongpandecha, the Chief Executive Officer of a digital asset broker called Bitazza Company Limited ("Bitazza"), is responsible for the operation of
Mr. Saran Siriphantnon Mr. Saran Siriphantnon, the Chief Executive Officer of a digital asset exchange called Satang Corporation Company Limited ("Satang"), is responsible for the operation