Mr. Win Udomrachtavanich Mr. Win Udomrachtavanich, a former Chairman of the Board, who is responsible for the operation of Daol Securities (Thailand) Public Company Limited ("Daol") failed
Mr. Kavin Phongpandecha Mr. Kavin Phongpandecha, the Chief Executive Officer of a digital asset broker called Bitazza Company Limited ("Bitazza"), is responsible for the operation of
Mr. Maurice Wee Ming Sheng Mr. Maurice Wee Ming Sheng, a former managing director of a digital asset exchange called Orbix Trade Company Limited ("Orbix") at the time of the incident, was
Mr. Anurak Thienthong During 24 October 2018 to 30 March 2021, Mr. Anurak Thienthong failed to report his acquisition and disposition of Thai Enger Holding Public Company Limited (“TIGER”) shares
Mrs. Pantipa Thirakanokvilai On January 30, 2013 and February 4, 2013, Mrs. Pantipa Thirakanokvilai, the financial controller of IT City Public Company Limited (IT) sold 374,440 shares of IT through
Mr. Sermkhun Kunawong Between August 15, 2012 and February 17, 2015, Mr. Sermkhun Kunawong failed to report to the SEC Office the acquisition or disposal of CMO Public Company Limited (CMO) shares
Mr. Pattarapob Ittisanyakorn On March 11, 2015, Mr. Pattarapob Ittisanyakorn acquired shares of K.C. Property Public Company Limited (KC) equal to 47.57 % of the total voting rights of KC. As a
Mr. Ratanachai Phatinavin Between February 24, 2014 and February 28, 2014, Mr. Ratanachai Phatinavin has illegally bought 9,000,000 shares of Eastern Star Real Estate Public Company Limited (ESTAR
Mr. Bordin Sangarayakul Between February 2, 2012 and May 15, 2012, Mr. Bordin Sangarayakul colluded or agreed with other principals to trade shares of Pylon Public Company Limited (“PYLON”) in
Mr. Noparat Jongyin Between February 2, 2012 and May 15, 2012, Mr. Noparat Jongyin colluded or agreed with other principals to trade shares of Pylon Public Company Limited (“PYLON”) in concealment to