-General Ruenvadee Suwanmongkol is the only official receives the “Outstanding Digital Organization Leader Award” this year. “SEC strong advocates on bringing digital technology to improve our services
List of head of Compliance Please wait... List of head of Compliance No. Company Name Commencement Date Securities Company Asset Management Company Investment Advisory Company Derivatives Brokerage
SCB ASSET MANAGEMENT COMPANY LIMITED|Foreign Investment Fund : FIF,Specific Fund | Offering Date : 08/10/2009 - 14/10/2009
SCB ASSET MANAGEMENT COMPANY LIMITED|Foreign Investment Fund : FIF,Specific Fund | Offering Date : 22/09/2009 - 28/09/2009
SCB ASSET MANAGEMENT COMPANY LIMITED|Foreign Investment Fund : FIF,Specific Fund | Offering Date : 29/09/2009 - 05/10/2009
ASSET PLUS FUND MANAGEMENT COMPANY LIMITED|Specific Fund | Offering Date : 20/08/2001 - 20/08/2001
หรือไม่ 1. ปฏิบัติตามประกาศ ทธ.39/2555 ในส่วนที่เกี่ยวกับการแต่งตั้ง Head of Compliance รายใหม่ 2. หากต้องปฏิบัติตามข้อ 1. จะสามารถขอผ่อนผันระยะเวลาการแต่ง
;">ที่ กลต.กธ. (ว) 21/2555 เรื่อง การแจ้งแต่งตั้งและสิ้นสุดการแต่งตั้ง Head of compliance ตามที่สำนักงานได้นำส่งประกาศคณะกรรมการกำกับตลาดทุน ที่ ทธ. 39/2555 เรื่อง การจัดการให้มีหน่วย
Limited to Precious Metals Derivatives Securities Businesses Company Name Head Office Data not found Other Financial Institution Company Name Head Office Data not found Foreign Juristic Person Company
Head Office Data not found Other Financial Institution Company Name Head Office Data not found Foreign Juristic Person Company Name Head Office Data not found Note : * refers to inactivated