Mr. Sanpapol Rattanarungroj Mr. Sanpapol Rattanarungroj , as managing director responsible for the operation of S.E.C. Auto Sales and Services PLC (SECC), failed to supervise SECC to submit the
Mr. Sanpapol Rattanarungroj Mr. Sanpapol Rattanarungroj , as managing director responsible for the operation of S.E.C. Auto Sales and Services PLC (SECC), failed to supervise SECC to submit the
AEC Securities Public Company Limited Between December 25, 2018 and May 22, 2020, AEC Securities Public Company Limited , as a securities and derivatives broker, failed to submitting an accurate and
Asia Wealth Securities Public Company Limited Between February 25, 2021 and May 31, 2021 Asia Wealth Securities Public Company Limited, as a securities broker, failed to submitting an accurate and
Mr. Sanpapol Rattanarungroj Mr. Sanpapol Rattanarungroj, as managing director responsible for the operation of S.E.C. Auto Sales and Services PLC (SECC), failed to supervise SECC to submit the
Mr. Katsuyuki Mizumachi Mr. Katsuyuki Mizumachi , Chairman of Management Committee, responsible for the operation of Chuo Senko (Thailand) Public Company Limited (CHUO), failed to supervise CHUO
Mr. Somprasong Panjalak Mr. Somprasong Panjalak, Managing Director who is responsible for the operation of Prime Road Power Public Company Limited (?PRIME?), had duty to supervise the preparation
Mr. Suthep Akkawuttikrai Mr. Suthep Akkawuttikrai, as an executive responsible for the operation of Picnic Corporation PLC (PICNI), failed to supervise the company to prepare and submit the financial
Mr. Somchit Bosereewong Mr. Somchit Bosereewong, as managing director responsible for the operation of Singha Paratech Public Company Limited (SINGHA), failed to supervise SINGHA to prepare and
Mr.Bho Boonsiri Mr. Bho Boonsiri, as managing director responsible for the operation of Datamat PLC (DTM), failed to supervise DTM to prepare and submit the financial statements for the six-month