Bangkok, 1 August 2017 ? The SEC requires that Polaris Capital Public Company Limited (POLAR) immediately submit the special audit report which has passed due on 24 July 2017. Previously, the SEC instructed POLAR to conduct a special audit on the sources, existence and completeness of the accounting records and the disclosure in the financial statements of the liabilities whose material information differed from what had appeared in the application for business rehabilitation. POLAR missed the s...
Mr. Bee Taechaubol Mr. Bee Taechaubol making the tender offer of securities of Electronics Industry Public Company Limited (EIC) purchased 1,017,500 shares of EIC in the Stock Exchange of Thailand at
, under their management to meet the requirement instead of being subject to immediate dissolution on the closing date of the unitholder register.In addition, the SEC is proposing a waiver of compulsory
certified public accountant No.………………..., working with ………….(name of the audit firm)…………., hereby certify as follows: 1. My immediate family members, including spouse and minor children, and I do not hold any
Commission: I, ………(applicant’s name)………., a certified public accountant No.………………..., working with ………….(name of the audit firm)…………., hereby certify as follows: 1. My immediate family members, including
of the country), hereby certify follows; 1. My immediate family member, including spouse (or equivalent) and dependent, and I do not hold any share of my audit clients and or its related entities. 2
Mr. Sunthorn Chaononghin On February 22, 2010, Mr. Sunthorn Chaononghin, an engineer of Solartron Public Company Limited (SOLAR), illegally purchased SOLAR shares in such a way as to take advantage
Mr. Sumit Chanmatee Between November 9 – November 22 , 2012, Mr. Sumit Chanmatee, the director of Rayong Purifier Public Company Limited (RPC), purchased 1,786,100 shares of RPC through the
Mr. Sermkhun Kunawong Between April 23, 2012 and May 14, 2012, Mr. Sermkhun Kunawong, the chief executive officer and director of CMO Public Company Limited (CMO), purchased CMO shares through his
Mr. Sermkhun Kunawong Between August 8, 2012 and September 13, 2012, Mr. Sermkhun Kunawong, the chief executive officer and director of CMO Public Company Limited (CMO), purchased CMO shares, through