Miss Orranan Boonma During 2017 - 2018, two former directors of Top Line Living Company Limited ("TOPLINE") which is the subsidiary of Polaris Capital Public Company Limited, namely (1
Mr. Nugul Phengkham During 2017 - 2018, two former directors of Top Line Living Company Limited ("TOPLINE") which is the subsidiary of Polaris Capital Public Company Limited, namely (1
Mr. Thanyapong Limwongyut During 2017 - 2018, two former directors of Top Line Living Company Limited ("TOPLINE") which is the subsidiary of Polaris Capital Public Company Limited, namely
Mr. Akkaradech Wattana During 2017 - 2018, two former directors of Top Line Living Company Limited ("TOPLINE") which is the subsidiary of Polaris Capital Public Company Limited, namely (1
Miss Watcharawee Kongkraijirakit (formerly known as Miss Pannipa Nuntaudomcharoe During 2017 - 2018, two former directors of Top Line Living Company Limited ("TOPLINE") which is the
Prince Grand Company Limited During 2017 - 2018, two former directors of Top Line Living Company Limited ("TOPLINE") which is the subsidiary of Polaris Capital Public Company Limited
TMB Asset Management Company Limited Between March 28, 2017 and December 9, 2021 TMB Asset Management Company Limited, a fund management company, failed to comply with the rules, conditions and
Mr. Somjin Sornpaisarn Mr. Somjin Sornpaisarn, a former Managing Director, Chief Investment Officer and Chief Investment Committee who is responsible for the operation of TMB Asset Management Company
TMB Asset Management Company Limited Between November 1, 2019 and November 30, 2021 TMB Asset Management Company Limited, a fund management company, failed to comply with the rules, conditions and
TMB Leasing Company Limited TMB Leasing Company Limited operated derivatives broker businesses in Thailand without proper licenses granted violating Section 16 of the Derivatives Act B.E.2546 (2003