List of head of Compliance Please wait... List of head of Compliance No. Company Name Commencement Date Securities Company Asset Management Company Investment Advisory Company Derivatives Brokerage
Facebook Page ชื่อ Stock leader : Unlicensed securities and derivatives business (Disclosure Date : 23/01/2024)
Facebook Page ชื่อ Stock leader : Unlicensed securities and derivatives business (Disclosure Date : 23/01/2024)
หรือไม่ 1. ปฏิบัติตามประกาศ ทธ.39/2555 ในส่วนที่เกี่ยวกับการแต่งตั้ง Head of Compliance รายใหม่ 2. หากต้องปฏิบัติตามข้อ 1. จะสามารถขอผ่อนผันระยะเวลาการแต่ง
Facebook Page ชื่อ Stock Market Leader : Unlicensed securities and derivatives business (Disclosure Date : 19/07/2024)
TISCO ASSET MANAGEMENT COMPANY LIMITED|Foreign Investment Fund : FIF,Specific Fund | Offering Date : 03/06/2010 - 11/06/2010
;">ที่ กลต.กธ. (ว) 21/2555 เรื่อง การแจ้งแต่งตั้งและสิ้นสุดการแต่งตั้ง Head of compliance ตามที่สำนักงานได้นำส่งประกาศคณะกรรมการกำกับตลาดทุน ที่ ทธ. 39/2555 เรื่อง การจัดการให้มีหน่วย
-General Ruenvadee Suwanmongkol is the only official receives the “Outstanding Digital Organization Leader Award” this year. “SEC strong advocates on bringing digital technology to improve our services
TISCO ASSET MANAGEMENT COMPANY LIMITED|Foreign Investment Fund : FIF,Specific Fund | Offering Date : 09/08/2010 - 20/08/2010
TISCO ASSET MANAGEMENT COMPANY LIMITED|Foreign Investment Fund : FIF,Specific Fund | Offering Date : 02/02/2012 - 10/02/2012