December 2010 Chalee Chantanayingyong 1 January 2011 - 4 August 2011 14 October 2011 - 31 December 2015 Vasant Thienhom 11 August 2011 - 13 October 2011 Tipsuda Thavaramara 1 January 2016 - 31 May 2019
- Present Deputy Secretary-General (assigned by the Secretary-General) Prasong Vinaiphat 19 November 2009 - 31 December 2010 Chalee Chantanayingyong 1 January 2011 - 4 August 2011 14 October 2011 - 31
SHARE : Detail Content Holiday 2024 Monday 1 January New Year's Day Monday 26 February Substitution for Makha Bucha Day (Saturday, 24 February 2024) Monday 8 April Substitution for Chakri
Somchai Richupan 9 October 1992 - 24 February 1997 Suthee Singhasaneh 26 January 1993 - 17 June 2002 Panas Simasathien 16 March 1994 - 3 July 2006 Viroj Nualkhair 15 January 1997 - 15 February
Somchai Richupan 9 October 1992 - 24 February 1997 Suthee Singhasaneh 26 January 1993 - 17 June 2002 Panas Simasathien 16 March 1994 - 3 July 2006 Viroj Nualkhair 15 January 1997 - 15 February
2004 (Letter of Intent) 20 January 2021 (Mutual Recognition of Funds) 11. Securities and Exchange Board of India (SEBI) India 10 April 2007 12. Financial Services Authority (OJK) Indonesia 15 October