SS National Logistic Company Limited On October 28, 2010, SS National Logistic Company Limited (SSNL) filed the inaccurate tender offer report (Form 247-4) of SSNL’s holding of Sermsuk Public
Daol Securities (Thailand) Public Company Limited Between November 11, 2017 and May 17, 2021 Daol Securities (Thailand) Public Company Limited, a private fund management company, failed to comply
Surapon Foods Public Company Limited Surapon Foods Public Company Limited ("SSF"), a securities issuer, had duties to prepare and submit an annual report for the year 2018 (Form 56-2) to
accurate tender offer report (Form 247-4) of SSNL’s holding of Sermsuk Public Company Limited (SSC) shares on October 28, 2010. The Form 247-4 did not disclose that Mr. Charoen Sirivadhanabhakdi is the
Mr. Sorapon Vongvadhanaroj Mr. Sorapon Vongvadhanaroj, a Chief Executive Officer for the operation of Surapon Foods Public Company Limited ("SSF"), shall be liable for SSF?s failure to
Miss Laksana Supsakorn Between 11 February 2021 and 27 September 2021, Miss Laksana Supsakorn, a Chairman of The Tipco Foods Public Company Limited ("TIPCO") changed her holding of TIPCO
liable for SSNL’s failure to disclose the accurate tender offer report (Form 247-4) of SSNL’s holding of Sermsuk Public Company Limited (SSC) shares on October 28, 2010. The Form 247-4 did not disclose
Mr. Prakorn Makjumroen During the period between 2021 and 2022, Mr. Prakorn Makjumroen, the former director and executive of STARK Corporation Public Company Limited (“STARK”) and its subsidiaries
International Engineering Public Company Limited (IEC), in the case where IEC did not exercise the right to purchase shares of Kokcharoen Green Energy Company Limited (KE) at the amount of 45 million baht
Miss Laksana Supsakorn Miss Laksana Supsakorn as the Chairman and Authorized Director of Tipco Foods Public Company Limited ("TIPCO") and Director of Tipco Asphalt Public Company Limited