Mr. Suphanan Rittiphairoj From 1 November 2016 to 12 January 2017, Mr. Suphanan Rittiphairoj, while serving as the Chief Operating Officer and a director of Inter Far East Energy Corporation Public
Mr. Thanawat Chansuwan From 1 November 2016 to 12 January 2017, Mr. Thanawat Chansuwan, while serving as the Chief Administrative Officer and a director of Inter Far East Energy Corporation Public
Mr. Porameth Rungrongtanin On November 16, 2018 Mr. Porameth Rungrongtanin acquired Digital Tech Planet Public Company Limited (DIGI) shares in the amount of 338,556,100 shares which equaled to 21.42
Mr. Virat Udomsinwatthana On June 13, 2007, Mr. Virat Udomsinwatthana failed to comply with rules specified by Securities and Exchange Commission. In this regard, Mr. Virat Udomsinwatthana acquired
. Pattanapong acquired shares of ASCON resulting in the aggregate number of shares held by him and six other persons exceeded trigger point at 25 percent of the total voting rights of ASCON. SEC Act S.247
Supervisory Board after he acquired NOBLE shares between January 31, 2013 and May 3, 2013 SEC Act S.246 Settlement Committee Meeting No. 9/2017 Settlement Committee Order No. 76/2017 Dated 18/10/2017
EASTERN ENERGY PLUS COMPANY LIMITED Eastern Energy Plus Company Limited (“EEP”) offered for sale newly issued securities in the category of debentures without approval from the SEC office which is in
AI Energy Public Company Limited AI Energy Public Company Limited (“AIE”) has failed to submit the reviewed financial statement for Q3/2016 to the SEC and the SET within the specified period. On June
ENERGY MAHANAKHON COMPANY LIMITED This case is in the process of inquiry by the inquiry official. SEC Act S.34 Criminal Complaint Filed with an Inquiry Official Dated 27/12/2023
Supervisory Board after he acquired or disposed TRAF between April 3, 2007 and August 7, 2008 which caused his aggregate holding of TRAF shares held by other persons to reach or pass a multiple of five percent