TMB Asset Management Company Limited Between March 28, 2017 and December 9, 2021 TMB Asset Management Company Limited, a fund management company, failed to comply with the rules, conditions and
Mr. Somjin Sornpaisarn Mr. Somjin Sornpaisarn, a former Managing Director, Chief Investment Officer and Chief Investment Committee who is responsible for the operation of TMB Asset Management Company
TMB Asset Management Company Limited Between November 1, 2019 and November 30, 2021 TMB Asset Management Company Limited, a fund management company, failed to comply with the rules, conditions and
TMB Leasing Company Limited TMB Leasing Company Limited operated derivatives broker businesses in Thailand without proper licenses granted violating Section 16 of the Derivatives Act B.E.2546 (2003
Mr. Somjin Sornpaisarn Mr. Somjin Sornpaisarn, a former Managing Director, Chief Investment Officer and Chief Investment Committee who is responsible for the operation of TMB Asset Management Company
and major shareholder of WHA, disseminate news about the negotiation of purchase deal with other listed company by giving interview to The Press which may cause any other person to understand that the