on Ease of Doing Business by World Bank SHARE : Detail Content T he World Bank discontinued the Doing Business Report in September 2021 and is in the process of establishing an alternative indicator to
on Ease of Doing Business by World Bank SHARE : Detail Content T he World Bank discontinued the Doing Business Report in September 2021 and is in the process of establishing an alternative indicator to
> SEC Board > Mr. Vuttikrai Leewiraphan Our Structure SHARE : Detail Content SEC Board Mr. Vuttikrai Leewiraphan Permanent-Secretary, Ministry of Commerce
, accepting listing and delisting and supervising securities businesses by approving rules issued by the Bank of Thailand, issuing and revoking licenses for securities business undertaking. Meanwhile, the Bank
) SEC_Vuttikrai Commerce Experiences Director General of Department of Intellectual Property , Ministry of Commerce Director General, Department of Business Development, Ministry of Commerce Inspector General
=title_th_default&fq=system_name%3AFinanacial%20Statements&fq=key_sitemap%3Aaboutus&start=0&rows=10 1 - 1 of 1 results Sort by: Relevance Date (Newest) Date (Oldest) English (United States) SEC_Vuttikrai Commerce
Board Mrs. Sorada Lertharpchit Representative of Permanent Secretary of Ministry of Commerce Education M.B.A., Srinakharinwirot University B.B.A. (Accounting), Ramkhamhaeng
Board Mrs. Sorada Lertharpchit Representative of Permanent Secretary of Ministry of Commerce Education M.B.A., Srinakharinwirot University B.B.A. (Accounting), Ramkhamhaeng
2013 - 25 August 2015 Voravidh Champeeratana 15 September 2015 - 1 June 2020 Pichit Akrathit 2 June 2020 - 1 July 2024 Wisit Wisitsora-at 2 July 2024 - Present Bank of
2013 - 25 August 2015 Voravidh Champeeratana 15 September 2015 - 1 June 2020 Pichit Akrathit 2 June 2020 - 1 July 2024 Wisit Wisitsora-at 2 July 2024 - Present Bank of