Vice President, Sustainability บริษัท อินโดรามา เวนเจอร์ส จำกัด (มหาชน) - นางเสาวนีย์ จรัสเรืองชัย Head of Sustainable Development บริษัท เซ็นทรัลพัฒนา จำกัด (มหาชน) แนวทางการดำเนินการในอนาคต ข้อสรุป
Licensees Approval Date 1 THE HONGKONG AND SHANGHAI BANGKING CORPORATION LIMITED 17 April 2002 2 BANG OF AYUDHYA PUBLIC COMPANY LIMITED 16 October 2003 3 DEUTSCHE BANK AG BANGKOK BRANCH 15 July 2004 4
, Engagement, AIGCC Ms. Ally Chin, Sustainable Investing Associate, Fidelity International Ms. Corrine Png, Regional Head of Equities Research and Stewardship, AIA Group / AIA Investment Management Ms. Enci Wang
, Engagement, AIGCC Ms. Ally Chin, Sustainable Investing Associate, Fidelity International Ms. Corrine Png, Regional Head of Equities Research and Stewardship, AIA Group / AIA Investment Management Ms. Enci Wang
TMBThanachart Bank Public Company Limited 3000 Phahon Yothin Rd., Chom Phon, Chatuchak, Bangkok 10900 August 27, 2004 4 Bank of Ayudhya Public Company Limited 1222 Rama III Road Bang Phongphang Yan Nawa Bangkok
Date 1 TISCO Bank Public Company Limited 48/2 TISCO Tower, North Sathorn Road Silom Bangrak Bangkok 10500 Thailand 11 August 2000 1 August 2001 2 Citibank,N.A 399 Sukhumvit Road, Interchange 21 Building
/ Derivatives Businesses Securities Brokerage Securities Companies and Other Financial Institutions Staff or Agent (individual) Acting as Investor Contact of the Company D erivatives Agent Licensed
• ผลงานวิจัยเรื่อง “Corporate Governance for Asian Publicly Listed Family-controlled Firms” - Presentation โดย Dr. Tony Tan Co-head of Ethics, Standards and Professional Conduct, CFA Institute วันที่
ปทุมวัน กรุงเทพฯ 10330 โทร. 0-2351-1800 DAOL Securities (Thailand) Public Company Limited Renamed from KTB ST Securities (Thailand) Public Company Limited since August 15,2022 87/2 CRC Tower, 18th Fl
ปทุมวัน กรุงเทพฯ 10330 โทร. 0-2351-1800 DAOL Securities (Thailand) Public Company Limited Renamed from KTB ST Securities (Thailand) Public Company Limited since August 15,2022 87/2 CRC Tower, 18th Fl