(Synopsis) 20/11/1998 4. Circular 3/2543 27/09/2000 27/09/2000 5. Circular 37/2545 24/12/2002 6. Circular 20/2541 06/07/1998 7. Circular 15/2538 23/08/1995 8. Circular 15/2537 19/08
(Synopsis) 20/11/1998 4. Circular 3/2543 27/09/2000 27/09/2000 5. Circular 37/2545 24/12/2002 6. Circular 20/2541 06/07/1998 7. Circular 15/2538 23/08/1995 8. Circular 15/2537 19/08
(Synopsis) 20/11/1998 4. Circular 3/2543 27/09/2000 27/09/2000 5. Circular 37/2545 24/12/2002 6. Circular 20/2541 06/07/1998 7. Circular 15/2538 23/08/1995 8. Circular 15/2537 19/08
(Synopsis) 20/11/1998 4. Circular 3/2543 27/09/2000 27/09/2000 5. Circular 37/2545 24/12/2002 6. Circular 20/2541 06/07/1998 7. Circular 15/2538 23/08/1995 8. Circular 15/2537 19/08
Mueang Khon Kaen, Khon Kaen ("Land and Buildings") to NML Co., Ltd. ("NML") at Baht 12,000,000. In this regard, the Board of Directors meeting assigned the executive committee or Chief Executive Officer to
Mr. Somjin Sornpaisarn Mr. Somjin Sornpaisarn, a former Managing Director, Chief Investment Officer and Chief Investment Committee who is responsible for the operation of TMB Asset Management Company
Mr. Sarun Yansopananan Mr. Sarun Yansopananan, the former chief executive officer and chief financial officer, responsible for the operation of Hydrotek Public Company Limited (“HYDRO”), shall be
Mr. Sarun Yansopananan Mr. Sarun Yansopananan, the former chief executive officer and chief financial officer, responsible for the operation of Hydrotek Public Company Limited (“HYDRO”), shall be
Mr. Sarun Yansopananan Mr. Sarun Yansopananan, the former chief executive officer and chief financial officer, responsible for the operation of Hydrotek Public Company Limited (“HYDRO”), shall be
Mr. Sarun Yansopananan Mr. Sarun Yansopananan, the former chief executive officer and chief financial officer, responsible for the operation of Hydrotek Public Company Limited (“HYDRO”), shall be