Mr. George Rogers Davison (Later changed to Mr.Jatudej Dejwicharn) Between September 1996 and March 1999, Mr. George Rogers Davison, the President of Phoenex Pulp & Paper PLC (PPPC
Mr. Tanes Sujjaboriboon Between April 20, 2018 and May 9, 2022, Mr. Tanes Sujjaboriboon, a director of Bangkok Sheet Metal Public Company Limited (“BM”) changed his holding of BM securities his
Miss Laksana Supsakorn Between 11 February 2021 and 27 September 2021, Miss Laksana Supsakorn, a Chairman of The Tipco Foods Public Company Limited ("TIPCO") changed her holding of TIPCO
Mr.Kumpol Plussind Between 26 February 2019 and 23 April 2020, Mr. Kumpol Plussind, a Managing Director of The Chularat Hospital Public Company Limited ("CHG") changed his holding of CHG
Sasavat Sirison Between October 8, 2019 and November 4, 2019. Mr. Sasavat Sirison’s wife, changed her Sahakol Equipment Public Company Limited (“SQ”) securities via her nominee's securities
to continuously trade shares of Asia Metal PLC (AMC) in concealment to mislead the public to believe that such shares were traded in great volume or that such share price was changed, causing the
Mr. Worawoot Ounjai Between 25 August 2020 and 4 February 2021, Mr. Worawoot Ounjai, a Company Director of The COL Public Company Limited ("COL") during that time, changed his holding of
without delay, and the processes and procedures shall be improved in line with the policy which has been changed; (4) report on the conformance of the information technology governance policy shall be
without delay, and the processes and procedures shall be improved in line with the policy which has been changed; (4) report on the conformance of the information technology governance policy shall be
without delay, and the processes and procedures shall be improved in line with the policy which has been changed; (4) report on the conformance of the information technology governance policy shall be