Mr. Abinash Majhi Mr. Abinash Majhi, as managing director responsible for the operation of Datamat PLC (DTM), failed to supervise DTM to prepare and submit the financial statements for the six-month
Mr. Nawat Triyapongpattana Mr. Nawat Triyapongpattana, the Managing director responsible for the operation of Ubis (Asia) Public Company Limited (UBIS), was liable for UBIS’s failure to prepare and
Mr. Nawat Triyapongpattana Mr. Nawat Triyapongpattana, the Managing director responsible for the operation of Ubis (Asia) Public Company Limited (UBIS), was liable for UBIS’s failure to prepare and
Mr. Chamnarn Pornpilailuck Mr. Chamnarn Pornpilailuck, a managing director responsible for the operation of Porn Prom Metal Public Company Limited (PPM), shall be liable for PPM’s failure to prepare
Mr.Pongsak Lothongkam Between December 13, 2016 and December 26, 2018, Mr.Pongsak Lothongkam , a director, chief executive director and managing director of SVI Public Company Limited (SVI) changed
Mr. Pichet Boonyapakdee On November 23, 2014, Mr. Pichet Boonyapakdee, the former director, executive director and managing director of accounting and finance responsible for the operation of M-Link
Mr. Somsit Moonsatan Mr. Somsit Moonsatan, Managing Director of Therm Engineering Co. Ltd., aided and abetted Mr. Sinsathien Aimpoolsub, the ex-director and executive of Professional Waste
Mr. Pattarapol Wongsasuthikul Between March 27, 2017 to June 25, 2018 Mr. Pattarapol Wongsasuthikul, Assistant Managing Director of Thai Rubber Latex Corperation (Thailand) Public Company Limited
Miss Chalongkwan Wongsasuthikul Between May 8, 2017 to August 11, 2017 Miss Chalongkwan Wongsasuthikul, Assistant Managing Director of Thai Rubber Latex Corperation (Thailand) Public Company
Mr.Kitisan Mookdee Mr.Kitisan Mookdee, a managing director responsible for the operation of K.C. Property Public Company Limited (KC), shall be liable for KC?s failure to prepare and submit the