Mr. Mitsuji konoshita On March 14, 2017, Mr. Mitsuji Konoshita, Chairman of the Board of Directors and Chief Executive Office of Group Lease Public Company Limited (“GL”) and its affiliates, informed
Mr. Riki Ishigami Mr. Riki Ishigami, a Chief Executive Officer for the operation of Group Lease Public Company Limited (GL), shall be liable for GL failure to prepare and submit the inaccurate
Mr. Sathar Chantrasettalead Mr. Sathar Chantrasettalead (formerly board of directors, chief financial officer, and company secretary of Stark Corporation Public Company Limited ("STARK"
Mr. Akalarp Yimwilai Mr. Akalarp Yimwilai, a former Chief Executive Officer of Zipmex Company Limited ("Zipmex"), who was responsible for the operation of Zipmex, shall be liable for Zipmex
Mr. Kavin Pongpandecha Mr. Kavin Pongpandecha, a former Chief Executive Officer of Bitazza Company Limited ("Bitazza"), who is responsible for the operation of Bitazza, shall be liable for
Mr. Sermkhun Kunawong Between April 23, 2012 and May 14, 2012, Mr. Sermkhun Kunawong, the chief executive officer and director of CMO Public Company Limited (CMO), purchased CMO shares through his
Mr. Sermkhun Kunawong Between August 8, 2012 and September 13, 2012, Mr. Sermkhun Kunawong, the chief executive officer and director of CMO Public Company Limited (CMO), purchased CMO shares, through
Mr. Somyos Anantaprayoon On October 27, 2014, Mr. Somyos Anantaprayoon, Chairman and Chief Executive Officer of WHA Corporation Public Company Limited (“WHA”) responsible for the operation of WHA
Miss Sugunya Sukjaroenkraisri Miss Sugunya Sukjaroenkraisri, a Chief Executive Officer for the operation of Asia Capital Group Public Company Limited (“ACAP”), shall be liable for ACAP’s failure to
Miss Sugunya Sukjaroenkraisri Miss Sugunya Sukjaroenkraisri, a Chief Executive Officer for the operation of Asia Capital Group Public Company Limited (“ACAP”), shall be liable for ACAP’s failure to