Mr. Wirat Tansawat During the period of 12 December 2013 to 27 November 2014, Mr. Wirat Tansawat joined with other 22 persons manipulating the share price of News Network Corporation Public Company
Mr. Amorn Promdeeraj During the period of 12 December 2013 to 27 November 2014, Mr. Amorn Promdeeraj joined with other 22 persons manipulating the share price of News Network Corporation Public
Mr. Supawun Rattanawun During the period of 12 December 2013 to 27 November 2014, Mr. Supawun Rattanawun joined with other 22 persons manipulating the share price of News Network Corporation Public
: - 12 December 2013 to 27 November 2014 joined with other 22 persons manipulating the share price of News Network Corporation Public Company Limited ("NEWS"); and - 23 June 2014 to 9 January
Mr. Tanapol Viratepsuporn During the period of 12 December 2013 to 27 November 2014, Mr. Tanapol Viratepsuporn joined with other 22 persons manipulating the share price of News Network Corporation
: - 12 December 2013 to 27 November 2014 joined with other 22 persons manipulating the share price of News Network Corporation Public Company Limited ("NEWS"); and - 23 June 2014 to 9 January
2013 to 27 November 2014 joined with other 22 persons manipulating the share price of News Network Corporation Public Company Limited ("NEWS"); and - 23 June 2014 to 9 January 2015 joined with
: - 12 December 2013 to 27 November 2014 joined with other 22 persons manipulating the share price of News Network Corporation Public Company Limited ("NEWS"); and - 23 June 2014 to 9 January
Mr. Nirandr Haetrakul During the period of 12 December 2013 to 27 November 2014, Mr. Nirandr Haetrakul joined with other 22 persons manipulating the share price of News Network Corporation Public
Mr. Suphanan Rittiphairoj From 1 November 2016 to 12 January 2017, Mr. Suphanan Rittiphairoj, while serving as the Chief Operating Officer and a director of Inter Far East Energy Corporation Public