penalty of 500,000.00 Baht - a bar from serving as a director or executive in a securities issuing company between 23/07/2024 and 22/03/2025  
bar from serving as a director or executive in a securities issuing company between 23/07/2024 and 22/07/2025 - a bar from serving as a director or executive in a
The meeting was chaired by Sirivipa Supantanet, SEC Deputy Secretary-General, along with distinguished members such as Emeritus Professor Vitit Muntarbhorn, Associate Professor Thongthippa
decision to execute transactions for investment in two associate companies. In addition, the auditor could not reach a conclusion for the audit of the financial statements for Q3/2016 on the basis of (1
Mr. Polsak Charoensiri Mr. Polsak Charoensiri , Chief Executive Officer responsible for the operation of Three Sixty Five Public Company Limited (?TSF?), shall be liable for TSF failure to prepare
Executives of Securities Companies (No.2) dated 23 November 2000. Clause 2. In this Notification: (1) “Securities company” means any company licensed to undertake securities business; (2) “Executive” means
Executives of Securities Companies (No.2) dated 23 November 2000. Clause 2. In this Notification: (1) “Securities company” means any company licensed to undertake securities business; (2) “Executive” means
Securities Companies (No.2) dated 23 November 2000. Clause 2. In this Notification: (1) “Securities company” means any company licensed to undertake securities business; (2) “Executive” means director, manager
Mr. Apisit Taisedtawatkul Mr. Apisit Taisedtawatkul, Chief Executive Officer, responsible for the operation of AJ Advance Technology Public Company Limited (?AJA?), shall be liable for AJA?s
Mr. Apisit Taisedtawatkul Mr. Apisit Taisedtawatkul, Chief Executive Officer, responsible for the operation of AJ Advance Technology Public Company Limited (?AJA?), shall be liable for AJA?s