Mr. Sinchok Sarinnapakron Between July 21, 2008 and August 20, 2008, Mr. Sinchok Sarinnapakron aided and abetted other persons to trade securities of Union Petrochemical Pubic Company Limited (UKEM
Mrs. Kanjana Suwannapasri Between October 17, 2008 and March 20, 2012, Mrs. Kanjana Suwannapasri failed to report to the SEC Office the acquisition or disposal of Union Petrochemical Pubic Company
Mr. Suvit Pipatvilaikul Between June 20, 2011 and December 6, 2012, Mr. Suvit Pipatvilaikul failed to report to the SEC Office the acquisition or disposal of Solution Corner (1998) Public Company
Mr. Surin Tohtubtiang Mr. Surin Tohtubtiang, Chief Executive Officer of Kuang Pei San Food Products Public Company Limited (“POMPUI”), who is responsible for the operation of POMPUI, had duty to
finance of Sky Tower Public Company Limited ("STOWER") at the time of the incident. He shall be liable for STOWER's failure to prepare and submit an accurate financial statement for the year
finance of Sky Tower Public Company Limited ("STOWER") at the time of the incident. He shall be liable for STOWER's failure to prepare and submit an accurate annual updated information
finance of Sky Tower Public Company Limited ("STOWER") at the time of the incident. He shall be liable for STOWER's failure to prepare and submit an accurate annual report for the year (Form
Mr. Somporn Mangmee Mr. Somporn Mangmee, the chairman of the executive committee (acting) who is responsible for the operation of PAE (Thailand) Public Company Limited (“PAE”), shall be liable for
Mr. Somporn Mangmee Mr. Somporn Mangmee, the chairman of the executive committee (acting) who is responsible for the operation of PAE (Thailand) Public Company Limited (“PAE”), shall be liable for
Mr. Varoonchai Leekanchanakorn Mr. Varoonchai Leekanchanakorn, a Managing Director who is responsible for the operation of Samchai Steel Industries Public Company Limited ("SAM"), had