Microsoft Word - Hearing FCIS-AI _edited by director_11_april เอกสารรับฟงความคิดเห็น เร่ือง การออกประกาศเพื่อรองรับการอนุญาตใหมีการเสนอขายหนวยลงทุนของ กองทุนรวมตางประเทศ (Collective Investment Scheme) แกผูลงทุนท่ีมิใชรายยอยในไทย อาคารจีพีเอฟ วิทยุ ช้ัน 10 และ 13-16 เลขที่ 93/1 ถนนวทิยุ แขวงลุมพินี เขตปทุมวนั กรุงเทพฯ 10330 โทรศัพท 0-2263-6499 หรือ 0-2695-9999 โทรสาร 0-2651-5949 ฝายกํากับและพัฒนาธุรกิจหลักทรัพย สํานักงานคณะกรรมการกํากับหลักทรัพยและตลาดหลักทรัพย เอกสารเผยแพร เลขท่ี อ...
Supervision Board (Secretary-General) Thirachai Phuvanatnaranubala 19 November 2009 - 4 August 2011 Chalee Chantanayingyong (acting) 5 August 2011 - 3 October 2011 Vorapol Socatiyanurak 4 October 2011
August 2011 Chalee Chantanayingyong (acting) 5 August 2011 - 3 October 2011 Vorapol Socatiyanurak 4 October 2011 - 15 April 2015 Chalee Chantanayingyong (acting) 16 April 2015 - 30 April 2015 Rapee
SHARE : Detail Content Holiday 2024 Monday 1 January New Year's Day Monday 26 February Substitution for Makha Bucha Day (Saturday, 24 February 2024) Monday 8 April Substitution for Chakri
ประกาศคณะกรรมการกำกับหลักทรัพย์และตลาดหลักทรัพย์ TRANSLATED VERSION As of August 11, 2015. Readers should be aware that only the original Thai text has legal force and that this English translation
ประกาศคณะกรรมการกำกับหลักทรัพย์และตลาดหลักทรัพย์ TRANSLATED VERSION As of August 11, 2015. Readers should be aware that only the original Thai text has legal force and that this English translation
2003 Captain Suchat Jaovisidha 10 February 2003 - 9 March 2004 Somkid Jatusripitak 10 March 2004 - 1 August 2005 Thanong Bidaya 2 August 2005 - 19 September 2006 M.R. Pridiyathorn Devakula 9 October
2003 Captain Suchat Jaovisidha 10 February 2003 - 9 March 2004 Somkid Jatusripitak 10 March 2004 - 1 August 2005 Thanong Bidaya 2 August 2005 - 19 September 2006 M.R. Pridiyathorn Devakula 9 October
August/2019 48 Mutual fund fees and expenses July/2019 49 Mutual fund fees and expenses June/2019 50 Mutual fund fees and expenses May/2019 51 Mutual fund fees and expenses April/2019 52 Mutual
Supervisory Board after he acquired or disposed TRAF between April 3, 2007 and August 7, 2008 which caused his aggregate holding of TRAF shares held by other persons to reach or pass a multiple of five percent