Mr. Kusol Sangkananta Mr. Kusol Sangkananta, Vice Chairman of the Board responsible for the operation of Max Metal Corporation Public Company Limited ("MAX") failed to supervise MAX to
Mr. Pongkawin Jungrungruangkit Mr. Pongkawin Jungrungruangkit, Chairman, responsible for the operation of the International Engineering Public Company Limited (“IEC”), failed to supervise IEC to
Mr. Uchai Vilailerstpoca On December 1, 2014, Mr. Uchai Vilailerstpoca acquired shares of Ocean Commerce Public Company Limited (OCEAN) which caused his aggregated holding of OCEAN shares to reach or
Mr. Uchai Vilailerstpoca On December 1, 2014, Mr. Uchai Vilailerstpoca acquired shares of Ocean Commerce Public Company Limited (OCEAN) which caused his aggregated holding of OCEAN shares to exceed
Mr. Anurag Thareratanavibool Mr. Anurag Thareratanavibool, the chief executive officer responsible for the operation of AI Energy Public Company Limited (“AIE”), has failed to supervise AIE to submit
Mr. Thanit Thareratanavibool Mr. Thanit Thareratanavibool, the chief executive officer responsible for the operation of Asian Insulators Public Company Limited (“AI”), has failed to supervise AI to
of Commerce 31 July 2024 Ms. Jomkwan Kongsakul, Deputy Secretary-General of the Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC), was invited as a panelist for the discussion on "Digital Asset Regulations and
the Thai Chamber of Commerce 30/07/2024 SEC media briefing on law enforcement and Thai ESG revised rules in July 2024 24/07/2024 SEC, UNDP and IOM co-organize a workshop on “Human Rights Due Diligence
the Thai Chamber of Commerce 30/07/2024 SEC media briefing on law enforcement and Thai ESG revised rules in July 2024 24/07/2024 SEC, UNDP and IOM co-organize a workshop on “Human Rights Due Diligence
) Corporate Governance Code 2017 Concept CG Code Practice Notes SET Ministry of Commerce Other related entities Company Profile Assessment National level Listed company level Archive CG CSR Anti