Satang Corporation Satang Corporation Co., Ltd. (Satang) by Mr. Poramin Insom, Chief Executive Officer and authorized director, entered into a market maker agreement with LLC Fair Expo by Mr. Mikalai
, failing to perform duties responsibly, and consenting to preparation of incorrect accounting records. The nine offenders are: (1) Miss Neeranuch Na Ranong, former vice chairman and chief executive director
holding the positions of AJD Chief Executive Officer and Managing Director) and Pipat (at the time holding the positions of AJD Chief Operating Officer and Director) jointly decided, approved and signed a
Mr. Supakorn Soontornkit Between September 7, 2017 and July 11, 2019; Mr. Supakorn Soontornkit, chief executive officer of Asia Wealth Asset Management Company Limited (?Asia Wealth Asset
Mr. Supakorn Soontornkit Between March 20, 2017 and September 18, 2018; Mr. Supakorn Soontornkit, chief executive officer of Asia Wealth Asset Management Company Limited (?Asia Wealth Asset
Mr. RAVI LOHTONG During the period of 8 - 30 October 2015, Mr. Ravi Lohthong, director and chief advisor to the executive board of Siam Sport Syndicate Public Company Limited ("SPORT") used
Mr. Sataporn Amornvorapak Mr. Sataporn Amornvorapak, the former Interim Chief Executive Officer, who is responsible for the operation of Raimon Land Public Company Limited ("RML"), shall be
Mr. Jeremy Lechemere King Between December 12, 2016 and July 1, 2019, Mr. Jeremy Lechemere King, chief executive officer of Siam Knight Fund Management Securities Co.,Ltd. (“SKFM”), a fund management
Mr. Jung Kyu Kim Mr. Jung Kyu Kim, a chief operating officer, a former chief financial officer and a former commissioner of Risk Management Committee, who is responsible for the operation of KTBST
Mr. Thanachart Siriphanukhema During the month of June 2014, Mr. Amorn Meemano (“Mr. Amorn”) at the time holding the positions of Chief Executive Officer and Managing Director of Crown Tech Advance