Rungcharoenchai, Ex-TUCC Director, Deputy CEO, and CFO, and (4) Miss Nitaya Yongphithakwatana, TUCC Director and General Administration Department Director, dishonestly violated their duties, obtained unlawful
Chatarose Uttamayothin, Miss Supanee Thongplengsri, Mr.Nakarin Saengsastra and ex-housewife prior to the disclosure of such inside information to the public on 28 August 2019. 19/05/2022 agreed to comply
) "#"%.')'./+')'#+"'% O*.% '" , .' % +$KL"% Unit : million #" 2 '4/!" 2& 2.1 '7!" 2.1.1 ' (market capitalization) )+!C! market capitalization #S('% Asia ex Japan + % #SO#""P%('%#*"!j'j ({ 2004 !+ % market cap #S O
Plc. Mr. Achporn Charuchinda Chairman (since July 2, 2013) Mr. Rungson Sriworasat Permanent Secretary, Ministry of Finance Ex-officio Member (since October 28, 2013) Ms. Chutima Bunyapraphasara
protection to investors, a distinction can usefully be made between ex ante and ex post shareholder rights. Ex ante rights are, for example, pre-emptive rights and qualified majorities for certain decisions
Ex-officio member (since October 1, 2010) Mr. A reepong Bhoocha-oom earned a BA in In te rna t iona l Management from Boston University, USA, an MA in the same field from Marshall University, and a PhD
following significant Board’s resolutions:- 1. Approved the acquisition by the Company and its wholly ordinary shares of Aesthetic Zecret Co., Ltd. (“At-Ze”) from its ex-shareholders and will increase capital
sell machinery to Chiang Rai Frozen Food Co., Ltd . Audit Com Please be Yours sin (Ms. Sin Chief Ex Authoriz mmittee opinio e informed ncerely, neemas Sotpip xecutive Offic zed Director on parpnukul) cer
, 2006, the SEC filed a criminal complaint with the Department of Special Investigation against the above 4 persons. The principals were 3 ex-POWER-P executives responsible for the company operation
of Asia, ex-China & Japan, Principles for Responsible Investment (PRI) ร่วมกล่าวเปิดงานสัมมนาออนไลน์ หัวข้อ “Responsible Investment in Practice: Implementing ESG Incorporation in Listed Equity and